+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-07-14 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor