+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:05AM in conference room 016.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223).
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 896-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor