+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 591-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor