+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 18
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HUS with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HUS.
- Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 6).
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Tupola.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-05-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor