+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 13
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
- Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor