+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Pouha, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola voting no (4) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 455-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, Matsumoto, Pouha, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 10:15AM in House conference room 329.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor