+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor