+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Fukumoto Chang.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor