+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 29).
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka, Tupola.
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.