+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:15AM in House conference room 325.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor