+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
- Referred to HSH, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor