+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 028, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Act 028, on 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 102-18).
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 102-18) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, K. Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 2:40PM in conference room 423.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; L. Thielen.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Todd, Ward.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 705) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3644) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 04-04-18 and will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 10:55AM in conference room 211.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2977) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 34).
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 770-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor