+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-14 8:35AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-14.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-05-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor