+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno, Yamane, McDermott.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-02-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor