+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 157, 6/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Act 157, on 6/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 752).
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, C. Lee excused (2).
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 750).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
- Reconsideration of action taken on 03-25-14.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:00PM in conference room 229.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 9:10AM in conference room 229.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Ruderman, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti Chair; Morikawa, Fukumoto Members.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392).
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 408) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-24-14.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 38).
- Passed First Reading.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Souki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Kawakami, Nakashima, Takumi, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 552-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Woodson.
On February 1, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:35AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, referral sheet 6
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor