+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor