+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to LCA/WAM.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Deferred until the 44th Day of the Regular Session of 2020.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from LCA/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3425) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 11:00AM in conference room 211.
- Re-Referred to LCA/WAM.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 209).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor