+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, C. Lee, Nakashima.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 2:00pm.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Woodson.
On February 1, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:35AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor