+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 2:00PM.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-16 5:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 80-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evans.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor