+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Har.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-13.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor