+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 123, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Act 123, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114-14).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 114-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Belatti, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Ige, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-23-14 4:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Ige, Ruderman, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto Members .
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 630) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3303) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2955) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-14 1:35PM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4).
- Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 360-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan.
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Oshiro, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Friday, 02-07-14 10:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor