+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 423.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 2:15PM in conference room 423.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 2:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Espero, Ruderman, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Kong, Woodson, Ward.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 593) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3511) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Ihara.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 281).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-09-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor