+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor