+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/AEN/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 326).
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 305-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor