+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206).
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 594-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-02-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.