+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 396-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 10:20AM in conference room 423.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.