+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 8
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor