+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-12-20 9:05AM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSH.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor