+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 130).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 825-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 337-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor