+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 087, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Act 087, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 119-14) as amended in (CD 1).
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Ing, Creagan, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Espero, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 119-14).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 4:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 3:25PM in conference room 325.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 3:25PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 3:45PM in conference room 325.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Espero, Hee, Chun Oakland Co-Chairs; Slom Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Ing Co-Chairs; Creagan, Thielen Members.
- Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 55
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 619) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3336) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3001) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 03-19-14 1:15PM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HTH/PSM, JDL/WAM.
- The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM/HTH, JDL/WAM.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/HTH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 318).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Wooley.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor