+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 8
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor