+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.