+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Takumi, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 01-30-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor