+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 658).
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 635).
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 579) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 269).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor