+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 3:00 pm in conference room 329.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 10:30am in Conference Room 329.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Baker Co-Chair; English.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Holt Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 685) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3552) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH.
- Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3087) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBR, CPH.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 84).
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Yamane, McDermott.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-09-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor