+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-06-14 11:35AM in conference room 325.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-14.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-04-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor