+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 142-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-02-16 2:01PM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor