+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 132, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Act 132, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Matsumoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 25-14).
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 25-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 2:15PM in conference room 423.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 2:00PM in conference room 423.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
- House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Woodson Co-Chairs; Jordan, Oshiro, Ward Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Slom Member.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 614) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3212) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2851) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 309).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Matsumoto voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Ward.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson, Carroll, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Jordan.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-03-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor