+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 265).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Onishi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 963-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 20
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-04-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor