+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ito, Oshiro.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14, 2:00PM.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 5:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14 at 8:30am.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-31-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor