+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Wakai, English Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, McKelvey, Holt Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Ward.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 679) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3008) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Galuteria.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 195).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to HRE/ETT, WAM.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Kobayashi.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 756-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Kong, Quinlan.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-18 at 2:00 PM in room 309.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 128-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 8
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.