+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Wakai, Fevella.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 54
- House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke added as Co-Chair. Representative C. Lee discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1883) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 353).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor