+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3178) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 3:10PM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 80).
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-12-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 8
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor