+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-31-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, HED, FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor