+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/HMS.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 315).
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1072-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 8
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.