+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 45) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor