+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor