+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-14-14 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- HD 1 adopted and recommitted to OMH for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Tokioka excused.
- Recommends recommittal to OMH.
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348-14) as amended in HD 1.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-14 11:05AM in conference room 325.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor