+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-12-15 11:30AM in conference room 325.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-15.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor