+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 8, 2014 in the House:
- Act 202, on 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
On July 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 202, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito, Wooley excused (2).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 56-14) as amended in (CD 1).
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Rhoads, Awana; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 56-14).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 3:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 3:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 3:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
- House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Awana, Fukumoto Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Galuteria Member.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 603) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3248) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-14 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 301).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 893-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Hashem, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Morikawa; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Belatti, Creagan, Oshiro.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-13-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.